Senate | 06/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3952.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4868.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3131.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |