LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR103
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR103
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR103
Compare Versions
SCR103 Chaptered June 1, 2016
SCR103 Enrolled May 27, 2016
SCR103 Amended May 19, 2016
SCR103 Amended May 12, 2016
SCR103 Introduced January 28, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR103 Chaptered June 1, 2016
SCR103 Enrolled May 27, 2016
SCR103 Amended May 19, 2016
SCR103 Amended May 12, 2016
SCR103 Introduced January 28, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare