California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 1, 2016

Amended

Bill May 19, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016