Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5599.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
August 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4650.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Set for hearing June 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4494.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
Set for hearing June 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|