California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016