LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR139
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR139
Compare Versions
SCR139 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SCR139 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SCR139 Amended August 9, 2016
SCR139 Amended June 9, 2016
SCR139 Introduced May 5, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR139 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SCR139 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SCR139 Amended August 9, 2016
SCR139 Amended June 9, 2016
SCR139 Introduced May 5, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare