Senate
|
07/22/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1983.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2359.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 996.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|