California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR35 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 20, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2015

Amended

Bill July 13, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015