LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR35
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR35
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR35
Compare Versions
SCR35 Chaptered July 22, 2015
SCR35 Enrolled July 20, 2015
SCR35 Amended July 13, 2015
SCR35 Amended July 9, 2015
SCR35 Amended June 30, 2015
SCR35 Amended May 6, 2015
SCR35 Introduced March 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SCR35 Chaptered July 22, 2015
SCR35 Enrolled July 20, 2015
SCR35 Amended July 13, 2015
SCR35 Amended July 9, 2015
SCR35 Amended June 30, 2015
SCR35 Amended May 6, 2015
SCR35 Introduced March 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare