Senate
|
09/18/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3177.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Dodd.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/23/2015
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1957.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Set for hearing July 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|