California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR79 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 6, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015