BILL NUMBER: SCR 79CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 179 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 16, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 8, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator McGuire (Principal coauthor: Senator Wolk) (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Dodd, Levine, and Wood) JULY 6, 2015 Relative to Trione Annadel State Park. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 79, McGuire. Trione Annadel State Park. This measure would request that the State Park and Recreation Commission, working with the Department of Parks and Recreation, rename Annadel State Park in the County of Sonoma as Trione Annadel State Park and, upon the receipt of donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, install new signs reflecting the name change. WHEREAS, Annadel State Park, located in the historic Valley of the Moon, an area popularized by author Jack London, became a state park in 1971, and includes over 5,000 acres of rolling hills, seasonal streams, meadows, trails, and woodlands, all located near a major metropolitan area in Sonoma County; and WHEREAS, The Sonoma County Regional Parks department serves the social, cultural, and outdoor recreation needs of the people of Sonoma County through the operation and maintenance of 49 regional parks and has assisted the state in serving the park needs of citizens statewide with the operation and maintenance of Annadel State Park; and WHEREAS, Annadel State Park in Sonoma County, originally named the Annadel Ranch State Park, is one of the most widely used parks in the state parks system; and WHEREAS, Henry Trione was a long-term resident of Sonoma County before his death at the age of 94 years and was a true "Renaissance Californian" who created a legacy across Sonoma County and the entire north coast region; and WHEREAS, Henry Trione's most significant and enduring contribution to Sonoma County and the State of California is widely acknowledged to be the creation of Annadel State Park in a wooded wilderness area overlooking the Santa Rosa plain that was slated for residential development; and WHEREAS, It is widely recognized that Annadel State Park would not exist today were it not for the personal tenacity of Henry Trione and his initial personal contribution of $1 million to preserve the 5,000-acre property; and WHEREAS, Henry Trione's actions to create Annadel State Park are remarkable because they occurred long before the importance of such public spaces closely linked to urban development was widely understood; and WHEREAS, In 2012 the Sonoma County Board of Supervisors recognized Henry Trione for his exceptional contributions to Annadel State Park and other local parks and bestowed upon him the title of "Honorary Regional Parks Ranger"; and WHEREAS, The Sonoma County Board of Supervisors and the Santa Rosa City Council have each voted unanimously to urge the State of California to similarly recognize Henry Trione and his achievements with respect to Annadel State Park, while retaining Annadel in the park's name; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature requests that the State Park and Recreation Commission, working with the Department of Parks and Recreation, rename Annadel State Park as Trione Annadel State Park and, upon receipt of donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, install new signs reflecting the name change; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.