Senate | 07/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4653.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5403.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3843.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |