LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR94
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR94
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR94
Compare Versions
SCR94 Chaptered July 7, 2016
SCR94 Enrolled July 5, 2016
SCR94 Amended June 13, 2016
SCR94 Amended May 3, 2016
SCR94 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR94 Chaptered July 7, 2016
SCR94 Enrolled July 5, 2016
SCR94 Amended June 13, 2016
SCR94 Amended May 3, 2016
SCR94 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare