California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR94 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 7, 2016

Amended

Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016