Senate | 07/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4638.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 59. Noes 7. Page 5516.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 2942.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Glazer. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Glazer. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |