California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR15 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/07/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SJR 15CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 81 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 7, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 27, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Glazer (Principal coauthor: Senator Hall) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Arambula, Baker, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Dababneh, Daly, Dodd, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Hadley, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Lackey, Levine, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, McCarty, Mullin, Nazarian, O'Donnell, Quirk, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Mark Stone, Ting, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) JULY 2, 2015 Relative to the Confederate States of America. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SJR 15, Glazer. Confederate States of America. This bill would urge the Congress and the President of the United States to rename any federal buildings, parks, roadways, or other federally owned property that bear the names of elected or military leaders of the Confederate States of America. WHEREAS, The Confederate States of America and its secessionist movement were rooted in the defense of slavery; and WHEREAS, Using the names of elected or military leaders of the Confederate States of America for federal buildings, parks, roadways, or other federally owned property only deepens the pain of those living under the legacy of slavery; and WHEREAS, The United States of America continues to struggle with racial equality and tolerance; and WHEREAS, The continued use of names of elected or military leaders of the Confederacy in public places is offensive to Americans who treasure the United States as one nation under God, indivisible, with liberty and justice for all; and WHEREAS, The horrific shooting deaths of nine African Americans attending church in South Carolina have once again raised the searing issue of racial violence and intolerance; and WHEREAS, The ensuing images of the killer wrapping himself in the Confederate flag points to the continued use of that emblem of cruel oppression as a way to further demean, offend, and wound whole segments of our society; and WHEREAS, The use of Confederate leaders' names in public schools, buildings, parks, roadways, or other federally owned property in California only serves to further the discriminatory agenda of current sympathizers of the ideology of the Confederate States of America, and is antithetical to California's mission of racial equality and tolerance; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature respectfully urges the Congress and the President of the United States to rename any federal buildings, parks, roadways, or other federally owned property that bear the names of elected or military leaders of the Confederate States of America; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States.