California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR15 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 2, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 7, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill July 15, 2015