Senate | 05/20/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2428.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected September 1). | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2174.) (August 25). | ||
Senate | 08/21/2015 | Set for hearing August 25. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |