California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 16, 2015

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 20, 2016

Amended

Bill March 8, 2016
Bill September 1, 2015