LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR18
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR18
Compare Versions
SJR18 Chaptered May 20, 2016
SJR18 Enrolled May 13, 2016
SJR18 Amended March 8, 2016
SJR18 Amended September 1, 2015
SJR18 Introduced July 16, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SJR18 Chaptered May 20, 2016
SJR18 Enrolled May 13, 2016
SJR18 Amended March 8, 2016
SJR18 Amended September 1, 2015
SJR18 Introduced July 16, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare