Senate | 04/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 715.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 17). | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 165.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 12/09/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |