California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2014

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2015

Amended

Bill March 26, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015