LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR2
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR2
Compare Versions
SJR2 Chaptered April 14, 2015
SJR2 Enrolled April 10, 2015
SJR2 Amended March 26, 2015
SJR2 Amended March 19, 2015
SJR2 Introduced December 9, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SJR2 Chaptered April 14, 2015
SJR2 Enrolled April 10, 2015
SJR2 Amended March 26, 2015
SJR2 Amended March 19, 2015
SJR2 Introduced December 9, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare