Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4882.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5708.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3689.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
April 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|