LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR22
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR22
Compare Versions
SJR22 Chaptered August 16, 2016
SJR22 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SJR22 Amended August 4, 2016
SJR22 Amended June 29, 2016
SJR22 Introduced March 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SJR22 Chaptered August 16, 2016
SJR22 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SJR22 Amended August 4, 2016
SJR22 Amended June 29, 2016
SJR22 Introduced March 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare