California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016