Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2149.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected July 6). (Corrected July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 829.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
April 7 hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|