LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR5
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR5
Compare Versions
SJR5 Chaptered July 6, 2015
SJR5 Enrolled July 2, 2015
SJR5 Amended June 25, 2015
SJR5 Amended April 29, 2015
SJR5 Amended April 22, 2015
SJR5 Amended March 19, 2015
SJR5 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SJR5 Chaptered July 6, 2015
SJR5 Enrolled July 2, 2015
SJR5 Amended June 25, 2015
SJR5 Amended April 29, 2015
SJR5 Amended April 22, 2015
SJR5 Amended March 19, 2015
SJR5 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare