LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR5
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR5
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 10, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
July 2, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 6, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 25, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 29, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 22, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 19, 2015
Compare