|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6615.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5558.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 4931.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4820.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|