California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill May 21, 2018
Bill April 23, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018