California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2018

Amended

Bill August 8, 2018
Bill June 21, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 26, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018