|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3422.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2907.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1810.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|