California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Amended

Bill July 11, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017
Bill March 9, 2017
Bill February 27, 2017