Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6489.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5279.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5004.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|