California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill April 26, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018