|
09/25/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 281, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2768.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|