California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017