Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017 Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330 Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 Introduced by Senator Berryhill February 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: ### SECTION 1. 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. (b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.