California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB330 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Bill No. 330 CHAPTER 281 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. [ Approved by Governor September 25, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State September 25, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
1+Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
22
3- Senate Bill No. 330 CHAPTER 281 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. [ Approved by Governor September 25, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State September 25, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled September 01, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017 Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled September 01, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate August 31, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2017
10+Amended IN Assembly July 03, 2017
11+Amended IN Senate April 18, 2017
12+
13+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
414
515 Senate Bill No. 330
6-CHAPTER 281
16+
17+Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017
18+
19+Introduced by Senator Berryhill
20+February 13, 2017
721
822 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
9-
10- [ Approved by Governor September 25, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State September 25, 2017. ]
1123
1224 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1325
1426 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1527
1628 SB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver.
1729
1830 The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.
1931
2032 The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.
2133
2234 This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.
2335
2436 ## Digest Key
2537
2638 ## Bill Text
2739
2840 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
2941
3042 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3143
3244 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3345
3446 SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
3547
3648 SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:
3749
3850 ### SECTION 1.
3951
4052 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
4153
4254 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
4355
4456 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
4557
4658
4759
4860 17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.
4961
5062 (b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.