07/10/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2017. | |||
07/10/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2316.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 538.) (March 29). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |