|
10/14/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 812, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2795.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2795.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pan.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 945.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|