California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill June 27, 2017
Bill May 9, 2017
Bill April 5, 2017