09/30/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 953, Statutes of 2018. | |||
09/30/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/30/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2018 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 6471.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4915.) (May 1). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |