California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB820 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill June 20, 2018
Bill May 3, 2018