Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 227, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6923.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4312.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|