California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2018

Amended

Bill August 16, 2018
Bill June 28, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018