|
09/29/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5477.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5409.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5372.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4381.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|