California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Amended

Bill August 22, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019